Docket for 16-1259
|
Feb 28 2017 | Application (16A869) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 19, 2017 to April 18, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Mar 07 2017 | Application (16A869) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 18, 2017. | | | Apr 18 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2017) | | | Apr 25 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | | May 02 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017. | | | May 15 2017 | Response Requested. (Due June 14, 2017) | | | Jun 08 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 14, 2017. | | | Jul 13 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jul 31 2017 | Reply of petitioner Antonio Farias filed. (Distributed) | | | Aug 02 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|