Docket for 16-1251
 | | No. 16-1251
| Title: | Dale W. Steager, West Virginia State Tax Commissioner, Petitioner v. CSX Transportation, Inc. | Docketed: | April 19, 2017 | Linked with 16A738 | | Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia | Case Numbers: | (15-0935) | Decision Date: | November 16, 2016 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
Jan 18 2017 | Application (16A738) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 14, 2017 to April 15, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Jan 25 2017 | Application (16A738) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 17, 2017. | | | Apr 17 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 19, 2017) | | | May 05 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 19, 2017. | | | Jun 14 2017 | Brief of respondent CSX Transportation, Inc. in opposition filed. | | | Jun 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Jul 27 2017 | Reply of petitioner Mark W. Matkovich, West Virginia State Tax Commissioner filed.(Distributed) | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|