Docket for 16-1102
|
Feb 17 2017 | Application (16A823) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2017 to March 29, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Feb 21 2017 | Application (16A823) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 29, 2017. | | | Mar 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2017) | | | Mar 30 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 22, 2017. | | | Apr 10 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Public Knowledge, et al. filed. | | | Apr 10 2017 | Brief amici curiae of The Hispanic Leadership Fund, et al. filed. | | | Apr 10 2017 | Brief amici curiae of The Software & Information Industry Association, et al. filed. | | | Apr 10 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed. | | | May 22 2017 | Brief of respondent Apple Inc. in opposition filed. | | | Jun 05 2017 | Reply of petitioners Samsung Electronics Co., et al. filed. | | | Jun 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017. | | | Jun 26 2017 | The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. | | | Oct 04 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. | | | Oct 17 2017 | Supplemental brief of petitioners Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., et al. filed. | | | Oct 18 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017. | | | Nov 06 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|