Docket for 16-1045
|
Feb 27 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2017) | | | Mar 07 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | | Mar 15 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017. | | | Mar 23 2017 | Response Requested. (Due April 24, 2017) | | | Apr 18 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2017. | | | May 09 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 23, 2017. | | | Jun 23 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jul 10 2017 | Reply of petitioner Ken Nowlin filed. | | | Jul 12 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|