|
Feb 19 2008 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2008) |
| |
Mar 13 2008 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 23, 2008. |
| |
Apr 23 2008 | Brief of respondents Jordan Beaty, et al. in opposition filed. |
| |
May 05 2008 | Reply of petitioner Republic of Iraq filed. (Distributed) |
| |
May 06 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 22, 2008. |
| |
May 27 2008 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
| |
Oct 09 2008 | Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by Plaintiffs Against Iraq. |
| |
Oct 21 2008 | Opposition of petitioner to motion for leave to file brief amicus curiae of Plaintiffs Against Iraq out of time filed. |
| |
Dec 05 2008 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
| |
Dec 17 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2009. |
| |
Jan 09 2009 | Petition GRANTED the case is consolidated with No. 08-539 and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The briefs of petitioners are to be filed on or before Thursday, February 19, 2009. The briefs of respondents are to be filed on or before Wednesday, March 18, 2009. Reply briefs, if any, are to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court. |
| |
Jan 09 2009 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Plaintiffs Against Iraq out of time DENIED. |
| |
Feb 19 2009 | Joint appendix filed (2 volumes). Statement of costs received. VIDED. |
| |
Feb 19 2009 | Brief of petitioner Republic of Iraq filed. VIDED. |
| |
Feb 23 2009 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, April 20, 2009. |
| |
Feb 26 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED. |
| |
Mar 09 2009 | Record received from U.S.C.A. for District of Columbia Circuit. (1 box) |
| |
Mar 13 2009 | DISTRIBUTED. VIDED |
| |
Mar 18 2009 | Brief of respondents Robert Simon, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) |
| |
Mar 18 2009 | Brief of respondents Jordan Beaty, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) |
| |
Mar 20 2009 | Brief amici curiae of James S. Vine, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) |
| |
Mar 24 2009 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED. |
| |
Mar 25 2009 | Record from the U.S.D.C . for the District of Columbia Circuit iis electronically filed |
| |
Mar 25 2009 | Sealed record received from the U.S.D.C. for the District of Columbia. (1 envelope) |
| |
Mar 25 2009 | Brief amici curiae of Eleven Members of Congress, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) |
| |
Mar 25 2009 | Motion for divided argument filed by respondents. VIDED. |
| |
Apr 01 2009 | Response to motion of the Solicitor General filed by respondents. |
| |
Apr 06 2009 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. |
| |
Apr 06 2009 | Motion for divided argument filed by respondents DENIED. |
| |
Apr 10 2009 | Reply of petitioner Republic of Iraq filed. VIDED. (Distributed) |
| |
Apr 13 2009 | Supplemental brief of respondents filed. VIDED. (Distributed) |
| |
Apr 14 2009 | Motion to strike supplemental brief of respondents filed by petitioners Republic of Iraq, et al. VIDED. |
| |
Apr 14 2009 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2009. |
| |
Apr 17 2009 | Motion of petitioners to strike supplemental brief of respondents GRANTED. |
| |
Apr 20 2009 | Argued. For petitioners: Jonathan S. Franklin, Washington, D.C.; and Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Thomas C. Goldstein, Washington, D.C. |
| |
Jun 08 2009 | Judgment REVERSED. Scalia, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. |
| |
Jul 10 2009 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
| |