Aug 16 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2021) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Sep 10 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Donta K. Davis to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Sep 15 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021. |
| |
Sep 21 2021 | Response Requested. (Due October 21, 2021) |
| |
Sep 22 2021 | Letter from counsel for petitioner filed. |
| Main Document |
Oct 21 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Oct 21 2021 | Brief of respondent Donta K. Davis in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service |
Nov 04 2021 | Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Dec 08 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022. |
| |
Jan 10 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022. |
| |
Jan 18 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022. |
| |
Jan 24 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
| |