Docket for 17-537
|
Jul 19 2017 | Application (17A82) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 8, 2017 to October 7, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | Jul 21 2017 | Application (17A82) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 9, 2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2017) | | | Nov 07 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 12, 2018, for all respondents. | | | Nov 13 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, California Chamber of Commerce, California Business Roundtable, Washington Legal Foundation, American Consumer Institute filed. | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 12 2018 | Brief of respondent Consumer Watchdog, Inc. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 12 2018 | Brief of respondent California Commissioner of Insurance in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 26 2018 | Reply of petitioners Mercury Casualty Company, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 31 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018. | | | Feb 20 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|