No. 16-489 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 13, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-1079) |
Decision Date: | April 7, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 11, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 7 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2016) |
Nov 15 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 14, 2016. |
Dec 14 2016 | Brief of respondent Rembrandt Vision Technologies, L.P. in opposition filed. |
Dec 27 2016 | Reply of petitioner Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. filed. |
Dec 28 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017. |
Jan 17 2017 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Paul M. Smith | Jenner & Block LLP | (202) 639-6060 |
Counsel of Record | 1099 New York Avenue, N.W. | |
Suite 900 | ||
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
psmith@jenner.com | ||
Party name: Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Thomas C. Goldstein | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. | (202) 362-0636 |
Counsel of Record | 7475 Wisconsin Ave. | |
Suite 850 | ||
Bethesda, MD 20814 | ||
tg@goldsteinrussell.com | ||
Party name: Rembrandt Vision Technologies, L.P. |