No. 01-10283 | Status: | DECIDED |
Title: | Jeri Emmett Laird, Petitioner | |
v. | ||
Aaron Spelling | ||
Docketed: | Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District |
May 21, 2002 | (B141706) |
~~Date~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 14 2002 | Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in |
forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 20, 2002) | |
Jul 2 2002 | Waiver of right of respondent Aaron Spelling to respond filed. |
Jul 3 2002 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2002 |
Oct 7 2002 | Petition DENIED. |
******************************************************** | |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Jeri Emmett Laird | 3810 1/2 West 1st Street | 2133812843 |
Los Angeles, CA 90004 | ||
Party name: Jeri Emmett Laird | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Robert S. Chapman | 1900 Avenue of the Stars | 3102017493 |
Suite 2100 | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90067-4590 | ||
Party name: Aaron Spelling | ||