No. 24A287 | |
Title: | Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Incorporated, et al., Applicants v. National Horsemen's Benevolent and Protective Association, et al. |
Docketed: | September 23, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-10520) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 19 2024 | Application (24A287) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Sep 23 2024 | Order entered by Justice Alito: Upon consideration of the application of counsel for the applicants, it is ordered that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, case No. 23-10520, is hereby administratively stayed pending further order of Justice Alito or of the Court. It is further ordered that a response to the application be filed on or before Monday, September 30, 2024, by 4 p.m. (EDT). |
Sep 23 2024 | Response of United States to application submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Sep 24 2024 | Amicus brief of Senator Mitch McConnell and Representatives Paul Tonko and Andy Barr submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | |
Sep 25 2024 | Amicus brief of Shannon Arvin, et al. submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Pratik Arvind Shah Counsel of Record | Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP 2001 K Street N.W. Washington, DC 20006 PSHAH@AKINGUMP.COM | 202-887-4210 |
Party name: Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Incorporated, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Other | ||
Gregory George Garre Counsel of Record | Latham & Watkins LLP 555 Eleventh Street, NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20004 GREGORY.GARRE@LW.COM | 202-637-2207 |
Party name: Shannon Arvin, et al. | ||
Paul E. Salamanca Counsel of Record | University of Kentucky College 279 Cassidy Ave. Lexington, KY 40502 psalaman20@gmail.com | 8593387287 |
Party name: Senator Mitch McConnell and Representatives Paul Tonko and Andy Barr |