No. 24A173 | |
Title: | Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al., Applicants v. Missouri, et al. |
Docketed: | August 13, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (24-2332, 24-2351) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 13 2024 | Application (24A173) to vacate injunction pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 13 2024 | Response to application (24A173) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due by 4pm (EDT) on August 19, 2024. |
Aug 19 2024 | Response to application from respondents Missouri, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 19 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 19 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Texas, Alaska, and South Carolina filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 20 2024 | Reply of applicants Joseph. R. Biden, Jr. et al. filed. |
ReplyProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Joseph. R. Biden, Jr. et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Joshua Michael Divine Counsel of Record | Office of the Missouri Attorney General Solicitor General 207 West High Street Jefferson City, MO 65101 josh.divine@ago.mo.gov | 573-751-8870 |
Party name: State of Missouri, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Sheng Tao Li Counsel of Record | New Civil Liberties Alliance 1225 19th Street NW Suite 450 Washingtion, DC 20036 sheng.li@ncla.legal | 202-869-5210 |
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance | ||
Aaron Lloyd Nielson Counsel of Record | Office of the Texas Attorney General P.O. Box 12548 (MC-059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 aaron.nielson@oag.texas.gov | 512-936-1700 |
Party name: Texas, Alaska, and South Carolina |