No. 24-57 | |
Title: | Coalition Life, Petitioner v. City of Carbondale, Illinois |
Docketed: | July 18, 2024 |
Linked with 23A1062 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-2367) |
Decision Date: | March 8, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 24 2024 | Application (23A1062) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 6, 2024 to July 16, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
May 29 2024 | Application (23A1062) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until July 16, 2024. |
Jul 16 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2024) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 05 2024 | Amicus brief of Jeannie Hill and the American Center for Law and Justice submitted. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Paul D. Clement Counsel of Record | Clement & Murphy, PLLC 706 Duke Street Alexandria, VA 22314 PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM | (202) 742-8900 |
Party name: Coalition Life | ||
Other | ||
Jay Alan Sekulow Counsel of Record | American Center for Law and Justice 201 Maryland Avenue, N.E. Washington, DC 20002 sekulow@aclj.org | 2025468890 |
Party name: Jeannie Hill and the American Center for Law and Justice | ||
Walter M. Weber | American Center for Law & Justice 201 Maryland Avenue, N.E. Washington, DC 20002-5703 WMWEBER@ACLJ-DC.ORG | 703.639.0775 |
Party name: Jeannie Hill and the American Center for Law and Justice |