No. 24-354 | |
Title: | Federal Communications Commission, et al., Petitioners v. Consumers' Research, et al. |
Docketed: | September 30, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-60008) |
Decision Date: | March 24, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 24, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 30 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2024) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Oct 01 2024 | Brief of respondents Consumers' Research, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Federal Communications Commission, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
R. Trent McCotter Counsel of Record | Boyden Gray PLLC 800 Connecticut Ave. NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20006 tmccotter@boydengray.com | 202-706-5488 |
Party name: Consumers' Research, et al. |