No. 23-980 | |
Title: | Facebook, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Amalgamated Bank, et al. |
Docketed: | March 6, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-15077) |
Decision Date: | December 4, 2023 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 04 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 11 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2024 to May 6, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 12 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2024. |
Apr 05 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Law Professors and Former Officials of the Securities and Exchange Commission filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 05 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 05 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2024 | Brief of respondents Amalgamated Bank, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 13 2024 | Reply of petitioners Facebook, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 14 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024. |
May 17 2024 | Letter of petitioners Facebook, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentOther | |
May 17 2024 | Supplemental Brief of Amalgamated Bank, et al. submitted. |
Main Document | |
Jun 03 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024. |
Jun 10 2024 | Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. |
Jun 13 2024 | Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. |
Main Document | |
Jul 09 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 9, 2024. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 24, 2024. |
Jul 26 2024 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, November 6, 2024. |
Aug 09 2024 | Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. |
Aug 09 2024 | Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER. |
Aug 09 2024 | Brief of petitioners Facebook, Inc., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 09 2024 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 16 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 16 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Corporate Governance filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 16 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Law Professors and Former Officials of the Securities and Exchange Commission filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 16 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 24 2024 | Brief of respondents Amalgamated Bank, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Kannon K. Shanmugam Counsel of Record | Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP 2001 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20006 KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM | (202) 223-7300 |
Party name: Facebook, Inc., et al. | ||
Joshua Seth Lipshutz | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com | (202) 955-8500 |
Party name: Facebook, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Kevin K. Russell Counsel of Record | Goldstein, Russell & Woofter LLC 1701 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Suite 200 Washington, DC 20006 kr@goldsteinrussell.com | 2022408433 |
Party name: Amalgamated Bank, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Christopher Emmanuel Duffy Counsel of Record | King & Spalding LLP 1185 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 cduffy@kslaw.com | (212) 556-2100 |
Party name: The Society for Corporate Governance | ||
Anthony J. Franze Counsel of Record | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 ANTHONY.FRANZE@ARNOLDPORTER.COM | 2029426479 |
Party name: Law Professors and Former Officials of the Securities and Exchange Commission | ||
Judson Owen Littleton Counsel of Record | Sullivan & Cromwell LLP 1700 New York Ave. NW Washington, DC 20006 littletonj@sullcrom.com | (202) 956-7085 |
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America; Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association | ||
Thomas Fuller Ogden Counsel of Record | Attorney At Law 1821 Kempton Ave. Monterey Park, CA 91755 thomas@ogden.law | 16265923165 |
Party name: Thomas Ogden | ||
Lyle Roberts Counsel of Record | Allen Overy Shearman Sterling US LLP 1101 New York Avenue NW Washington, DC 20005 lyle.roberts@aoshearman.com | 202 508-8108 |
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation |