No. 23-1324 | |
Title: | Thomas Perttu, Petitioner v. Kyle Brandon Richards |
Docketed: | June 20, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-1298) |
Decision Date: | March 19, 2024 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 17 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 22, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 05 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 22, 2024 to August 21, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 08 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2024. |
Aug 19 2024 | Brief of respondent Kyle Richards in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 30 2024 | Reply of petitioner Thomas Perttu filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 04 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. |
Oct 04 2024 | Petition GRANTED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Ann Maurine Sherman Counsel of Record | Michigan Department of Attorney General G. Mennen Williams Building P.O. Box 30212 Lansing, MI 48909 SHERMANA@MICHIGAN.GOV | 517-335-7628 |
Party name: Thomas Perttu | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
J. Scott Ballenger Counsel of Record | Appellate Litigation Clinic University of Virginia School of Law 580 Massie Road Charlottesville, VA 22903 JSCOTTBALLENGER@GMAIL.COM | 202-701-4925 |
Party name: Kyle Richards |