No. 23-1141 | |
Title: | Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Estados Unidos Mexicanos |
Docketed: | April 22, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-1823) |
Decision Date: | January 22, 2024 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 18 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 03 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 08 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2024 to July 3, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 09 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 3, 2024. |
May 15 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 20 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 21 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amici curiae of The American Constitutional Rights Union, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amici curiae of National Rifle Association of America and Independence Institute filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. and FPC Action Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute and Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Michigan Coalition for Responsible Gun Owners filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amici curiae of National Association for Gun Rights and the National Foundation for Gun Rights filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senator Ted Cruz, U.S. Representative Darrell Issa, and 25 Other Members of Congress filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 22 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of The Second Amendment Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 03 2024 | Brief of respondent Estados Unidos Mexicanos in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 17 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. |
Jul 17 2024 | Reply of petitioners Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 08 2024 | Letter of petitioner Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. received. (Distributed) |
Main Document | |
Aug 15 2024 | Letter of respondent Estados Unidos Mexicanos received. (Distributed) |
Main Document | |
Oct 04 2024 | Petition GRANTED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Noel John Francisco Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 NJFRANCISCO@JONESDAY.COM | (202) 879-3939 |
Party name: Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., et al. | ||
Michael Lyn Rice | Harrison Law LLC 141 W Jackson Blvd Suite 2055 Chicago, IL 60604 mikerice@hlawllc.com | 312-638-8781 |
Party name: Colt’s Manufacturing Company, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Catherine Emily Stetson Counsel of Record | Hogan Lovells US LLP 555 13th Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20004-1109 CATE.STETSON@HOGANLOVELLS.COM | 2026375491 |
Party name: Estados Unidos Mexicanos | ||
Other | ||
H. Christopher Bartolomucci Counsel of Record | Schaerr | Jaffe LLP 1717 K Street NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20006 CBARTOLOMUCCI@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM | 202-787-1060 |
Party name: U.S. Senator Ted Cruz, U.S. Representative Darrell Issa, and 25 Other Members of Congress | ||
Steven W. Dulan Counsel of Record | The Law Offices of Steven W. Dulan, PLC 5311 Park Lake Road East Lansing, MI 48823 swdulan@stevenwdulan.com | 517-332-3149 |
Party name: Michigan Coalition for Responsible Gun Owners | ||
Lawrence S. Ebner Counsel of Record | Atlantic Legal Foundation 1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200 Washington, DC 20006 lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org | 202-729-6337 |
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation | ||
Matthew Conrad Forys Counsel of Record | Landmark Legal Foundation 19415 Deerfield Avenue, Suite 312 Leesburg, VA 20176 MATT@LANDMARKLEGAL.ORG | 703-554-6100 |
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation | ||
Philip S. Goldberg Counsel of Record | Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP 1800 K Street, NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20006 pgoldberg@shb.com | 202-662-4860 |
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers and American Tort Reform Association | ||
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee Counsel of Record | NRA-ILA 11250 Waples Mill Road Fairfax, VA 22030 jgreenlee@nrahq.org | (208) 271-2494 |
Party name: National Rifle Association of America and Independence Institute | ||
John Mercer Masslon II Counsel of Record | Washington Legal Foundation 2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW Washington, DC 20036 JMASSLON@WLF.ORG | (202) 588-0302 |
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation | ||
Thomas Ryan McCarthy Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC 1600 Wilson Boulevard Suite 700 Arlington, VA 22209 TOM@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM | 7032439423 |
Party name: The Second Amendment Foundation | ||
Erin E. Murphy Counsel of Record | Clement & Murphy, PLLC 706 Duke Street Alexandria, VA 22314 ERIN.MURPHY@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM | (202) 742-8900 |
Party name: National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. | ||
John Joseph Park Jr. Counsel of Record | Law Offices of Jack Park P.O. Box 3073 Gainesville, GA 30503 jackparklaw@gmail.com | 678-608-1920 |
Party name: The American Constitutional Union and LTC Allen West (Ret) | ||
David H. Thompson Counsel of Record | Cooper & Kirk, PLLC 1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM | 202-220-9600 |
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. and FPC Action Foundation | ||
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr. Counsel of Record | Montana Attorney General's Office 215 North Sanders Street Helena, MT 59601 PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV | 406-444-2026 |
Party name: State of Montana | ||
David Christian Tryon Counsel of Record | The Buckeye Institute 88 East Broad Street Columbus, OH 43215 d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org | 6142244422 |
Party name: The Buckeye Institute and Mountain States Legal Foundation's Center to Keep and Bear Arms | ||
David Alan Warrington Counsel of Record | Dhillon Law Group, Inc. 2121 Eisenhower Avenue Suite 608 Alexandria, VA 22314 dwarrington@dhillonlaw.com | 7035741206 |
Party name: National Association for Gun Rights and the National Foundation for Gun Rights |