No. 23-1122 | |
Title: | Free Speech Coalition, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas |
Docketed: | April 16, 2024 |
Linked with 23A925 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-50627) |
Decision Date: | March 7, 2024 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 12 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 16, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 12 2024 | Application (23A925) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Apr 17 2024 | Response to application (23A925) requested by Justice Alito, due by 4 p.m. (EDT), on April 26, 2024. |
Apr 26 2024 | Response to application from respondent Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2024 | Reply of applicant Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. |
ReplyProof of Service | |
Apr 30 2024 | Application (23A925) referred to the Court. |
Apr 30 2024 | Application (23A925) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. |
May 07 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2024 to June 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 07 2024 | Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioners filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 08 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 30, 2024. |
May 16 2024 | Brief amici curiae of American Booksellers for Free Expression, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 16 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of International Centre for Missing and Exploited Children filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 16 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation and Woodhull Freedom Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 16 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 30 2024 | Brief of respondent Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 31 2024 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 04 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024. |
Jun 04 2024 | Reply of petitioners Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2024. |
Jul 02 2024 | Petition GRANTED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Derek L. Shaffer Counsel of Record | Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP 1300 I Street NW, Suite 900 Washington, DC 20005 DEREKSHAFFER@QUINNEMANUEL.COM | (202) 538-8000 |
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Aaron Lloyd Nielson Counsel of Record | Office of the Texas Attorney General P.O. Box 12548 (MC-059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 aaron.nielson@oag.texas.gov | 512-936-1700 |
Party name: Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas | ||
Other | ||
Amer Shahid Ahmed Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 200 Park Avenue New York, NY 10166 aahmed@gibsondunn.com | (212) 351-2427 |
Party name: International Centre for Missing and Exploited Children | ||
Kenneth A. Bamberger Counsel of Record | Boalt Hall Schol of LawUniversity of CA University of CA-7200 Bulid. 7200 Berkeley, CA 94720-7200 kbamberger@berkeley.edu | 5106436218 |
Party name: American Booksellers for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Authors Guild, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, and Freedom to Read Foundation | ||
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere Counsel of Record | Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression 700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE Suite 340 Washington, DC 20003 bob.corn-revere@thefire.org | 215-717-3473 |
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression | ||
Aaron David Mackey Counsel of Record | Electronic Frontier Foundation 815 Eddy Street San Francisco, CA 94109 AMACKEY@EFF.ORG | 415 436 9333 |
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation and Woodhull Freedom Foundation |