No. 23-1038 | |
Title: | Food and Drug Administration, Petitioner v. Wages and White Lion Investments, L.L.C., dba Triton Distribution, et al. |
Docketed: | March 19, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-60766, 21-60800) |
Decision Date: | January 3, 2024 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 19 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 18, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Apr 04 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2024 to May 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 05 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2024. |
Apr 18 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Public Health, Medical, and Community Groups filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 18 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Logic Technology Development LLC filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 15 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Vaping Industry Stakeholders filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 17 2024 | Brief of respondents Wages and White Lion Investments, L.L.C., dba Triton Distribution, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 04 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024. |
Jun 04 2024 | Reply of petitioner Food and Drug Administration filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2024. |
Jul 02 2024 | Petition GRANTED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Food and Drug Administration | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Eric N. Heyer Counsel of Record | Thompson Hine LLP 1919 M Street, N.W. Suite 700 Washington, DC 20036 ERIC.HEYER@THOMPSONHINE.COM | 202-331-8800 |
Party name: Wages and White Lion Investments, L.L.C., dba Triton Distribution, et al. | ||
Other | ||
William Barnett Schultz Counsel of Record | Zuckerman Spaeder LLP 1800 M Street, NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20036 wschultz@zuckerman.com | (202) 778-1800 |
Party name: Public Health, Medical, and Community Groups | ||
J. Gregory Troutman Counsel of Record | Troutman Law Office, PLLC. 4205 Springhurst Boulevard Suite 201 Louisville, KY 40241 JGTATTY@YAHOO.COM | 502-412-9179 |
Party name: Vaping Industry Stakeholders | ||
Misha Tseytlin Counsel of Record | Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP 227 West Monroe Street Suite 3900 Chicago, IL 60606 MISHA.TSEYTLIN@TROUTMAN.COM | 608-999-1240 |
Party name: Logic Technology Development LLC |