No. 21-725 | |
Title: | PeopleConnect, Inc., Petitioner v. Barbara Knapke |
Docketed: | November 16, 2021 |
Linked with 21A160 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-35690) |
Decision Date: | October 20, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 12 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2021) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 12 2021 | Application (21A160) for a stay pending disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 12 2021 | Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 19 2021 | Letter of applicant received. |
Main Document | |
Nov 23 2021 | Letter of applicant received. |
Main Document | |
Nov 23 2021 | Joint stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed. |
Main Document | |
Nov 23 2021 | Application (21A160) withdrawn. |
Dec 01 2021 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Adam G. Unikowsky Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 1099 New York Avenue, NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 AUnikowsky@jenner.com | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: PeopleConnect, Inc. |