No. 21-1444 | |
Title: | Dolgen California, LLC, Petitioner v. Tricia Galarsa |
Docketed: | May 16, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Fifth Appellate District |
Case Numbers: | (F082404) |
Decision Date: | November 19, 2021 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | February 9, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 09 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 27 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 15, 2022 to July 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 31 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 15, 2022. |
Jul 15 2022 | Brief of respondent Tricia Galarsa in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 03 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
Oct 03 2022 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Viking River Cruises, Inc. v. Moriana, 596 U. S. ___ (2022). |
Nov 04 2022 | Judgment and mandate issued. |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald Counsel of Record | McGuireWoods LLP 800 East Canal Street Richmond, VA 23219 mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com | 804-775-4716 |
Party name: Dolgen California, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Glenn Ari Danas Counsel of Record | Clarkson Law Firm, P.C. 22525 Pacific Coast Highway Malibu, CA 90265 gdanas@clarksonlawfirm.com | 2137884050 |
Party name: Tricia Galarsa |