No. 20-397 | |
Title: | Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, Petitioner v. Hector Emiliano Portillo Martinez |
Docketed: | September 25, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-9584) |
Decision Date: | April 30, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 25 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2020) |
Sep 25 2020 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Nov 10 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020. |
Dec 01 2020 | Response Requested. (Due December 31, 2020) |
Dec 16 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 31, 2020 to February 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Dec 17 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2021. |
Feb 10 2021 | Brief of respondent Hector Emiliano Portillo Martinez in opposition filed. |
Feb 24 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021. |
Apr 29 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021. |
May 03 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Christine Marie Hernandez Counsel of Record | Hernandez & Associates, PC 1801 York Street Denver, CO 80206 chernandez@hdezlaw.com | 303-623-1122 |
Party name: Hector Emiliano Portillo Martinez |