No. 20-1335 | |
Title: | A. P., Petitioner v. Vermont |
Docketed: | March 24, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Vermont |
Case Numbers: | (2019-246) |
Decision Date: | October 9, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 08 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 15 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent The State of Vermont to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 21 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021. |
May 17 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
James Anthony Valente Counsel of Record | Costello, Valente & Gentry, P.C. PO Box 483 Brattleboro, VT 05301 valente@cvglawoffice.com | 802-257-5533 |
Party name: A.P. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
David Tartter | Department of State's Attorneys 110 State Street Montpelier, VT 05633-6401 david.tartter@vermont.gov | 802-828-5557 |
Party name: The State of Vermont |