No. 19-1451 | |
Title: | Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH, Petitioner v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. |
Docketed: | July 2, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-1368, 2019-1369) |
Decision Date: | November 19, 2019 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 28, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 26 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 3, 2020) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 28 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 3, 2020 to August 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 29 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2020. |
Aug 24 2020 | Brief of respondent Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 08 2020 | Reply of petitioner Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Adam Baker Banks Counsel of Record | Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP 767 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10153 adam.banks@weil.com | 212 310-8000 |
Party name: Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Douglas H Carsten Counsel of Record | Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati 12235 El Camino Real San Diego, CA 92130 dcarsten@wsgr.com | 8583502305 |
Party name: Mylan | ||
Steffen Nathanael Johnson Counsel of Record | Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati 1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor Washington, DC 20006 sjohnson@wsgr.com | (202) 973-8888 |
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. | ||
Richard Lee Torczon Jr. | Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati PC 1700 K Street, NW Floor 5 Washington, DC 20006-3817 rtorczon@wsgr.com | 202-973-8811 |
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. |