No. 17-628 | |
Title: | Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Petitioner v. Richard W. Lozier, Jr., et al. |
Docketed: | October 31, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-1417) |
Decision Date: | June 23, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 2, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 30 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2017) |
Nov 17 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Office of Consumer Advocate to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Nov 29 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Richard W. Lozier, Jr.; Nick Wagner; and Geri Huser to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Nov 30 2017 | Brief of respondent Windstream Iowa Communications, LLC in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 19 2017 | Reply of petitioner Sprint Communications Company, L.P. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. |
Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Christopher J. Wright Counsel of Record | 1919 M Street, NW, Eighth Floor Washington, DC 20036 cwright@hwglaw.com | (202) 730-1300 |
Party name: Sprint Communications Company, L.P. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Andrew R. Anderson Counsel of Record | Faegre Baker Daniels LLP 801 Grand Avenue 33rd Floor Des Moines, IA 50309 andrew.anderson@faegrebd.com | 5154474703 |
Party name: Windstream Iowa Communications, LLC | ||
David Jay Lynch Counsel of Record | Iowa Utilities Board 1375 East Court Avenue Des Moines, IA 50319-0069 david.lynch@iub.iowa.gov | 515.725.7333 |
Party name: Richard W. Lozier, Jr.; Nick Wagner; and Geri Huser | ||
Mark R. Schuling Counsel of Record | Iowa Office of Consumer Advocate- Iowa Department 1375 East Court Avenue Des Moines, IA 50312 mark.schuling@oca.iowa.gov | 5157257203 |
Party name: Office of Consumer Advocate |