No. 17-202 Vide 17-482 | |
Title: | David Daleiden, aka Robert Daoud Sarkis, et al., Petitioners v. National Abortion Federation, et al. |
Docketed: | August 7, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-15360) |
Decision Date: | March 29, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 5, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 03 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 6, 2017) |
Aug 08 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent National Abortion Federation to respond filed. |
Aug 16 2017 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, David Daleiden, et al. on 08/18/2017 |
Sep 05 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Legal Center for Defense of Life filed. |
Sep 06 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Mississippi Justice Institute, et al. filed. |
Sep 06 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of American Catholic Lawyers Association, Inc. filed. |
Sep 06 2017 | Brief amici curiae of The Attorneys General of Alabama, et al. filed. |
Oct 02 2017 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, David Daleiden, et al. on 10/02/2017 VIDED |
Nov 14 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. |
Nov 27 2017 | Response Requested. (Due December 27, 2017) |
Dec 19 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 20 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 26, 2018. |
Jan 16 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 26, 2018 to February 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 16 2018 | Response to motion from petitioner David Daleiden, et al. filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 18 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 26, 2018. |
Feb 26 2018 | Brief of respondent National Abortion Federation in opposition filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 12 2018 | Reply of petitioners David Daleiden, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 13 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018. |
Apr 02 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Catherine Wynne Short Counsel of Record | P.O. Box 1313 Ojai, CA 93024-1313 LLDFOjai@cs.com | (707) 337-6880 |
Party name: David Daleiden, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Marc Andrew Hearron Counsel of Record | Morrison & Foerster, LLP 2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Suite 6000 Washington, DC 20006 mhearron@mofo.com | (202)-778-1663 |
Party name: National Abortion Federation | ||
Other | ||
James M. Bendell Counsel of Record | Bendell Law Firm, PLLC 1110 West Park Place, Suite 326 Coeur d'Alene, ID 83814 james@bendelllawfirm.com | 208-215-2255 |
Party name: American Catholic Lawyers Association, Inc. | ||
Tanya D. Ellis Counsel of Record | Forman Watkins & Krutz, LLP 210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200 Jackson, MS 39201 tanya.ellis@formanwatkins.com | (601)-960-8600 |
Party name: Mississippi Justice Institute, et al. | ||
Brunn Wall Roysden Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General 1275 West Washington Street Phoenix, AZ 85007 beau.roysden@azag.gov | 602 542 5025 |
Party name: The Attorneys General of Alabama, et al. | ||
Andrew L. Schlafly Counsel of Record | 939 Old Chester Road Far Hills, NJ 07931 aschlafy@aol.com | 908-719-8608 |
Party name: Legal Center for Defense of Life |