No. 17-1108 | |
Title: | Medical Device Business Services, Inc., fka DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. United States, ex rel. Antoni Nargol and David Langton, et al. |
Docketed: | February 7, 2018 |
Linked with 17A628 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-1442) |
Decision Date: | July 26, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 27, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 11 2017 | Application (17A628) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2017 to February 5, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer. |
Main Document | |
Dec 12 2017 | Application (17A628) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until February 5, 2018. |
Feb 05 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 9, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 16 2018 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Medical Device Business Services, Inc., fka DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., et al.. |
Blanket Consent | |
Mar 07 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Coalition for Government Procurement, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 09 2018 | Brief of respondents United States ex rel. Antoni Nargol and David Langton, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 09 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2018 | Reply of petitioners Medical Device Business Services, Inc., fka DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 28 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018. |
Apr 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Paul D. Clement Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 655 Fifteenth Street, NW Washington, DC 20005 paul.clement@kirkland.com | 2028795000 |
Party name: Medical Device Business Services, Inc., fka DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
W. Mark Lanier Counsel of Record | Lanier Law Firm 6810 FM 1960 Rd. West Houston, TX 77069-3804 wml@lanierlawfirm.com | 713-659-5200 |
Party name: United States ex rel. Antoni Nargol and David Langton, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Lawrence S. Ebner Counsel of Record | Capital Appellate Advocacy PLLC 1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200 Washington, DC 20006 lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com | 202-729-6337 |
Party name: Coalition for Government Procurement, et al. | ||
David William Ogden Counsel of Record | Wilmer Cutler Pickering 1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Washington, DC 20006 david.ogden@wilmerhale.com | 202-663-6000 |
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al. |