No. 16-1169 | |
Title: | Ariel Arencibia, Petitioner v. Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corporation |
Docketed: | March 27, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-15387) |
Decision Date: | September 12, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 9, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 20 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2017) |
Apr 20 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 26, 2017. |
Jun 06 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corporation to respond filed. |
Jun 14 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. |
Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Christopher D. Donovan Counsel of Record | Roetzel & Andress, LPA 850 Park Shore Drive Third Floor Naples, FL 34103 cdonovan@roetzel.com | (239) 213-3865 |
Party name: Ariel Arencibia | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Andrew Baak Counsel of Record | Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 Chicago, IL 60654 andrew.baak@bartlit-beck.com | (312) 494-4400 |
Party name: Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corporation |