Docket for 15-8119
No. 15-8119 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Richard Delmer Boyer, Petitioner |
v. |
Ronald Davis, Warden |
|
Docketed: | February 9, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-99006) |
Decision Date: | July 16, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 26, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 19 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 10, 2016) |
Mar 10 2016 |
Brief of respondent Ronald Davis, Warden in opposition filed. |
Mar 24 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 6 2016 |
Rescheduled. |
Apr 18 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016. |
Apr 25 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 29, 2016. |
May 2 2016 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer dissenting from denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) |
|