Docket for 14A596
No. 14A596 | |
Title: |
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, Applicant |
v. |
Electric Power Supply Association, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 5, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-1486, 12-1088, 12-1091, 12-1093) |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 5 2014 |
Application (14A596) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 16, 2014 to January 15, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Dec 8 2014 |
Application (14A596) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 15, 2015. |
|