~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 8 2015 |
Application (14A1155) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 21, 2015 to June 19, 2015, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
May 8 2015 |
Application (14A1155) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until June 19, 2015. |
Jun 5 2015 |
Application (14A1155) to extend further the time from June 19, 2015 to July 20, 2015, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Jun 8 2015 |
Application (14A1155) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until July 20, 2015. |
Jul 20 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2015) |
Aug 7 2015 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner. |
Aug 12 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 18, 2015. |
Aug 19 2015 |
Brief amicus curiae of Dean Richard K. Lyons filed. |
Aug 19 2015 |
Brief amicus curiae of Senator Richard Blumenthal filed. |
Sep 17 2015 |
Brief of respondents Robert J. Bahash, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 7 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015. |
Oct 7 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Boca Raton Firefighters and Police Pension Fund filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 2 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |