~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 30 2015 |
Application (15A26) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 15, 2015 to September 13, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jul 14 2015 |
Application (15A26) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 13, 2015. |
Sep 11 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2015) |
Sep 30 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent Margaret Rudin to respond filed. |
Oct 14 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015. |
Oct 15 2015 |
Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed. |
Oct 19 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due November 18, 2015) |
Nov 16 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 19, 2016. |
Jan 16 2016 |
Brief of respondent Margaret Rudin in opposition filed. |
Jan 16 2016 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Margaret Rudin. |
Jan 28 2016 |
Reply of petitioners Jo Gentry, Warden, et al. filed. |
Feb 3 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |