No. 14-896 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | January 26, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-16859) |
Decision Date: | September 17, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 24, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 21 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2015) |
Feb 24 2015 | Brief of respondent George W. Gibbs in opposition filed. |
Feb 24 2015 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent George W. Gibbs. |
Mar 11 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015. |
Mar 18 2015 | Supplemental brief of petitioners Robert LeGrand, Warden, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Mar 30 2015 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Mar 30 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Victor-Hugo Schulze II. | Senior Deputy Attorney General | (702) 486-3110 |
Office of the Attorney General | ||
555 E. Washington Avenue, Suite 3900 | ||
Las Vegas, NV 89101 | ||
vschulze@ag.nv.gov | ||
Party name: Robert LeGrand, Warden, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Ryan Norwood | Asst. Federal Public Defender | (702) 388-6577 |
Counsel of Record | 411 East Bonneville Avenue | |
Suite 250 | ||
Las Vegas, NV 89101 | ||
ryan_norwood@fd.org | ||
Party name: George W. Gibbs |