No. 14-518 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 4, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia |
Case Nos.: | (3:13cv678) |
Decision Date: | October 7, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 31 2014 | Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 4, 2014) |
Dec 4 2014 | Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Gloria Personhuballah and James Farkas. |
Dec 22 2014 | Reply of appellant Eric Cantor, et al., Appellants filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 23 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Mar 25 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 | Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Alabama Legislative Black Caucus v. Alabama, 575 U. S. ____ (2015). |
May 1 2015 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Appellants: | ||
Michael A. Carvin | Jones Day | (202) 879-3939 |
Counsel of Record | 51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
macarvin@jonesday.com | ||
Party name: Eric Cantor, et al., Appellants | ||
Attorneys for Appellees: | ||
Marc E. Elias | Perkins Coie, LLP | (202) 654-6200 |
Counsel of Record | 700 Thirteenth Street, NW | |
Suite 600 | ||
Washington, DC 20005-3960 | ||
melias@perkinscoie.com | ||
Party name: Gloria Personhuballah,and James Farkas |