No. 14-407 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 8, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-35579) |
Decision Date: | July 10, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 7 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 7, 2014) |
Nov 6 2014 | Brief of respondent Tyree Duane Harris in opposition filed. |
Nov 6 2014 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Tyree Duane Harris. |
Nov 25 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 12, 2014. |
Dec 15 2014 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Dec 15 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Anna M. Joyce | Solicitor General | (503) 378-4402 |
Oregon Department of Justice | ||
1162 Court Street | ||
Salem, OR 97301-4096 | ||
anna.joyce@doj.state.or.us | ||
Party name: Jeff Premo, Superintendent, Oregon State Penitentiary | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Robert A. Weppner | 4110 SE Hawthorne Boulevard, No.127 | (503) 901-5239 |
Counsel of Record | Portland, OR 97214-5246 | |
raw-law@comcast.net | ||
Party name: Tyree Duane Harris |