No. 14-287 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 10, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of North Carolina |
Case Nos.: | (75PA13) |
Decision Date: | June 12, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 10 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2014) |
Oct 10 2014 | Brief of respondent DocRx, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Oct 28 2014 | Reply of petitioner EMI Services of North Carolina, LLC filed. |
Oct 29 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 14, 2014. |
Nov 17 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
William R. Terpening | Nexsen Pruet, PLLC | (704) 338-5358 |
Counsel of Record | 227 West Trade Street | |
Suite 1550 | ||
Charlotte, NC 28202 | ||
wterpening@nexsenpruet.com | ||
Party name: EMI Services of North Carolina, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Perry C. Henson Jr. | Henson & Talley LLP | (996) 275-0587 |
Counsel of Record | Post Office Box 3525 | |
Greensboro, NC 27402 | ||
phenson@hensonlawyers.com | ||
Party name: DocRx, Inc. |