No. 14-276 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 9, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70014) |
Decision Date: | March 25, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 10, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 8 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2014) |
Oct 6 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 10, 2014. |
Oct 9 2014 | Brief amicus curiae of Captiol Punishment Center of the University of Texas School of Law filed. |
Oct 27 2014 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 9, 2015. |
Jan 6 2015 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 16, 2015. |
Jan 16 2015 | Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Feb 3 2015 | Reply of petitioner Christopher Chubasco Wilkins filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 4 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2015. |
Feb 9 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2015. |
Feb 23 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Seth P. Waxman | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP | (202) 663-6000 |
Counsel of Record | 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com | ||
Party name: Christopher Chubasco Wilkins | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Richard B. Farrer | Assistant Solicitor General | (512) 936-1836 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059) | ||
Austin, TX 78711-2548 | ||
rfarrer@texasattorneygeneral.gov | ||
Party name: William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division | ||
Douglas Dean Geyser | 209 W. 14th Street (MC 059) | (512) 463-2100 |
Counsel of Record | Austin, TX 78711 | |
douglas.geyser@texasattorneygeneral.gov | ||
Party name: William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division | ||
Other: | ||
Jim Marcus | Capital Punishment Clinic | (512) 232-1475 |
University of Texas School of Law | ||
727 E. Dean Keeton Street | ||
Austin, TX 78705 | ||
JMarcus@law.utexas.edu | ||
Party name: Captiol Punishment Center of the University of Texas School of Law |