No. 14-152 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 12, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-1604) |
Decision Date: | May 9, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 7 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 11, 2014) |
Aug 28 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 10, 2014, for all respondents. |
Oct 8 2014 | Brief of respondents Panel Processing, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 15 2014 | Reply of petitioner Brian Sexton filed. |
Oct 22 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 7, 2014. |
Nov 10 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 14, 2014. |
Nov 17 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
John J. Korzen | Wake Forest University School of Law | (336) 758-5832 |
Counsel of Record | Appellate Advocacy Clinic | |
P.O. Box 7206, Reynolda Station | ||
Winston-Salem, NC 27109 | ||
korzenjj@wfu.edu | ||
Party name: Brian Sexton | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Michael B. Kimberly | Mayer Brown LLP | (202)-263-3127 |
Counsel of Record | 1999 K Street NW | |
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
mkimberly@mayerbrown.com | ||
Party name: Panel Processing, Inc., et al. |