No. 14-1122 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 17, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-8003) |
Decision Date: | January 12, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 16 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2015) |
Mar 31 2015 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner. |
Apr 7 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 18, 2015, for all respondents. |
Apr 16 2015 | Brief amicus curiae of The American Antitrust Institute filed. |
Apr 16 2015 | Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed. |
Apr 16 2015 | Brief amici curiae of Economists and Professors filed. |
May 18 2015 | Brief of respondents Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., et al. in opposition filed. |
May 26 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 11, 2015. |
May 26 2015 | Reply of petitioner Motorola Mobility LLC filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 15 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Thomas C. Goldstein | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. | (202) 362-0636 |
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850 | ||
Bethesda, MD 20814 | ||
tg@goldsteinrussell.com | ||
Party name: Motorola Mobility LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Robert D. Wick | Covington & Burling LLP | (202) 662-5487 |
1201 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
rwick@cov.com | ||
Party name: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., et al. | ||
Other: | ||
Richard M. Brunell | Director of Legal Advocacy | (202) 600-9640 |
American Antitrust Institute | ||
1730 Rhode Island Avenue NW | ||
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
rbrunell@antitrustinstitute.org | ||
Party name: The American Antitrust Institute | ||
Erik S. Jaffe | Erik S. Jaffe, P.C. | (202) 237-8165 |
5101 34th Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20008 | ||
jaffe@esjpc.com | ||
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers | ||
Delmer R. Mitchell Jr. | Schmiedskamp,Robertson, Neu & Mitchell | (217) 223-3030 |
525 Jersy Street | ||
Quincy, IL 62301 | ||
dmitchell@srnm.com | ||
Party name: Economists and Professors |