No. 13-947 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 10, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-1540, 12-1541, 12-1661) |
Decision Date: | August 19, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 12, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 7 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 12, 2014) |
Mar 7 2014 | Waiver of right of respondent The University of Utah to respond filed. |
Mar 19 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 4, 2014. |
Mar 31 2014 | Response Requested . (Due April 30, 2014) |
Apr 25 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 8, 2014. |
May 8 2014 | Brief of respondent The University of Utah in opposition filed. |
May 22 2014 | Reply of petitioners Robert L. Caret, et al. filed. |
May 27 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 12, 2014. |
Jun 16 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Paul M. Smith | Jenner & Block LLP | (202) 639-6000 |
Counsel of Record | 1099 New York Avenue, N.W. | |
Suite 900 | ||
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
psmith@jenner.com | ||
Party name: Robert L. Caret, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Steve W. Berman | Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP | (206) 623-7292 |
Counsel of Record | 1918 Eighth Avenue | |
Suite 3300 | ||
Seattle, WA 98101 | ||
steve@hbsslaw.com | ||
Party name: The University of Utah |