No. 13-92 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 22, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-1085) |
Decision Date: | March 29, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 23, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 18 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2013) |
Aug 20 2013 | Brief of respondent David Hannington in opposition filed. |
Sep 4 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Sep 9 2013 | Reply of petitioner Sun Life and Health Insurance Company filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Joshua Bachrach | Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP | (215) 606-3906 |
The Curtis Center, Ste.1130 East | ||
Independence Square West | ||
Philadelphia, PA 19106-3308 | ||
joshua.bachrach@wilsonelser.com | ||
Party name: Sun Life and Health Insurance Company | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Gisele Muriel Nadeau | 34 Carlyle Road | (207) 671-0327 |
Counsel of Record | Portland, ME 04103 | |
ginadeau@maine.rr,com | ||
Party name: David Hannington |