No. 13-552 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 1, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-20726) |
Decision Date: | July 2, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 2, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 30 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2013) |
Nov 25 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 2, 2014. |
Dec 23 2013 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 31, 2014. |
Jan 31 2014 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Feb 14 2014 | Reply of petitioner Scott Michael Long filed. |
Feb 19 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 7, 2014. |
Mar 10 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Fred A. Rowley Jr. | Munger Tolles & Olson LLP | (213) 683-9100 |
355 South Grand Avenue | ||
35th Floor | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90071 | ||
Fred.Rowley@mto.com | ||
Party name: Scott Michael Long | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |