No. 13-53 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 11, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-2167) |
Decision Date: | January 30, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 10, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 9 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 12, 2013) |
Aug 6 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 11, 2013. |
Sep 11 2013 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Sep 25 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 11, 2013. |
Sep 25 2013 | Reply of petitioner Donald Maynard Buffin, Jr. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 15 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Chad A. Readler | Jones Day | (614) 469-3939 |
Counsel of Record | 325 John H. McConnell Blvd., Ste.600 | |
P.O. Box 165017 | ||
Columbus, OH 43216 | ||
careadler@jonesday.com | ||
Party name: Donald Maynard Buffin, Jr. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |