~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 19 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 24, 2013) |
Oct 21 2013 |
Waiver of right of respondents Colleen Gardner, in Her Official Capacity as New York State Commissioner of Labor, et al. to respond filed. |
Nov 4 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 26, 2013. |
Nov 13 2013 |
Response Requested . (Due December 13, 2013) |
Dec 4 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 27, 2014. |
Jan 27 2014 |
Brief of respondents Colleen Gardner, in Her Official Capacity as New York State Commissioner of Labor, et al. in opposition filed. |
Feb 10 2014 |
Reply of petitioner RI, Inc., et al. filed. |
Feb 12 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 28, 2014. |
Mar 3 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |