No. 13-1367 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 14, 2014 | |||
Linked with 13A927 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-1196, 12-1200) |
Decision Date: | August 19, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 3, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 12 2014 | Application (13A927) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 3, 2014 to May 2, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Mar 13 2014 | Application (13A927) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 2, 2014. |
May 2 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 13, 2014) |
Jun 3 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 14, 2014. |
Jul 14 2014 | Brief of the Federal Respondents in opposition filed. |
Jul 14 2014 | Brief of respondents American Furniture Manufacturers Committee for Legal Trade, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jul 29 2014 | Reply of petitioners Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., et al. filed. |
Jul 30 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Kevin K. Russell | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. | (202) 362-0636 |
Counsel of Record | 7475 Wisconsin Ave, Suite 850 | |
Bethesda, MD 20814 | ||
kr@goldsteinrussell.com | ||
Party name: Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Joseph W. Dorn | King & Spalding LLP | (202) 737-0500 |
Counsel of Record | 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW | |
Suite 200 | ||
Washington, DC | ||
jdorn@kslaw.com | ||
Party name: American Furniture Manufacturers Committee for Legal Trade, et al. | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States, et al. |