No. 12-477 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 19, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-3604) |
Decision Date: | June 4, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 25, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 15 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2012) |
Nov 9 2012 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 12, 2012. |
Dec 12 2012 | Brief of respondents Anthony Williams, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 21 2012 | Reply of petitioners Duke Energy International, Inc., et al. filed. |
Dec 26 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 11, 2013. |
Jan 14 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Joseph R. Guerra | Sidley Austin LLP | (202) 736-8000 |
1501 K Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
jguerra@sidley.com | ||
Party name: Duke Energy International, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Paul M. De Marco | Markovits, Stock & De Marco | (513) 651-3700 |
Counsel of Record | 119 East Court Street, Suite 530 | |
Cincinnati, OH 45202 | ||
pdemarco@msdlegal.com | ||
Party name: Anthony Williams, et al. |