No. 12-444 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 11, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-2271, 10-2273, 10-2321) |
Decision Date: | June 6, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 11, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 9 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2012) |
Nov 13 2012 | Brief of respondents Tire Engineering & Distribution, LLC, Jordan Fishman, Bearcat Tire A.R.L.,and BCATCO A.R.L. in opposition filed. |
Nov 27 2012 | Reply of petitioners Shandong Linglong Robber Company, Ltd., nka Linglong Group Company Ltd., et al. filed. |
Nov 28 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 4, 2013. |
Jan 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Howard M. Radzely | Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP | (202) 739-3000 |
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
Party name: Shandong Linglong Robber Company, Ltd., nka Linglong Group Company Ltd., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
William Edgar Copley | Weisbrod Matteis & Copley PLLC | (202) 499-7900 |
Counsel of Record | 1900 M Street NW | |
Suite 850 | ||
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
wcopleywmclaw..com | ||
Party name: Tire Engineering & Distribution, LLC, Jordan Fishman, Bearcat Tire A.R.L.,and BCATCO A.R.L. |