No. 12-376 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 26, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-13673) |
Decision Date: | June 29, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 21 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2012) |
Oct 25 2012 | Brief of respondent Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida in opposition filed. |
Nov 2 2012 | Reply of petitioner John V. Furry, as Personal Representative of the Estate and Survivors of Tatiana H. Furry filed. |
Nov 5 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 20, 2012. |
Nov 26 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Bruce S. Rogow | Bruce S. Rogow PA | (954) 767-8909 |
500 East Broward Boulevard | ||
Suite 1930 | ||
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394 | ||
brogow@rogowlaw.com | ||
Party name: John V. Furry, as Personal Representative of the Estate and Survivors of Tatiana H. Furry | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Bernardo Roman III. | Tribal Attorney for the Miccosukee Tribe | (305) 894-5214 |
Counsel of Record | P.O. Box 440021, Tramiami Trail | |
Miami, FL 33144 | ||
bromanlaw@bellsouth.net | ||
Party name: Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida |