No. 12-374 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 25, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Tennessee, Middle Division |
Case Nos.: | (M2011-01443-COA-R3-CV) |
Decision Date: | January 27, 2012 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | June 22, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 20 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2012) |
Oct 25 2012 | Brief of respondent Richard H. Roberts, Commissioner of Tennessee Department of Revenue in opposition filed. |
Oct 25 2012 | Brief amicus curiae of International Reading Association filed. |
Nov 5 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 20, 2012. |
Nov 5 2012 | Reply of petitioner Scholastic Book Clubs, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 26 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
George S. Isaacson | Brann & Isaacson | (207) 786-3566 |
184 Main Street | ||
Lewiston, ME 04240 | ||
Party name: Scholastic Book Clubs, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Charles Larry Lewis | Deputy Attorney General | (615) 741-2968 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General and Reporter | |
425 5th Avenue North, P.O. Box 20207 | ||
Nashville, TN 37202-0207 | ||
larry.lewis@ag.tn.gov | ||
Party name: Richard H. Roberts, Commissioner of Tennessee Department of Revenue | ||
Other: | ||
Anil Madan | 77 Franklin St., 6th Floor | (617)-398-0656 |
Boston, MA 02110 | ||
anil@madans.com | ||
Party name: International Reading Association |