No. 12-330 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 18, 2012 | |||
Linked with 11A1231 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-9006) |
Decision Date: | April 17, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 21 2012 | Application (11A1231) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 16, 2012 to September 14, 2012, submitted to Justice Breyer. |
Jun 22 2012 | Application (11A1231) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until September 14, 2012. |
Sep 14 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2012) |
Oct 11 2012 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 19, 2012. |
Nov 19 2012 | Brief of respondent Department of Agriculture in opposition filed. |
Dec 5 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 4, 2013. |
Jan 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Lynne F. Riley | Riley Law Group LLC | (617) 399-7300 |
Counsel of Record | 100 Franklin Street | |
Boston, MA 02110 | ||
riley@rileylawgroup.com | ||
Party name: Cathy Prescott, Executor of the Estate of Dorothy R. Duby | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Department of Agriculture |