No. 12-1395 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 29, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Minnesota |
Case Nos.: | (A12-0164) |
Decision Date: | December 3, 2012 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | February 27, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 24 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 28, 2013) |
Jul 17 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Jul 23 2013 | Response Requested . (Due August 22, 2013) |
Aug 22 2013 | Brief of respondent Minnesota Commissioner of Public Safety in opposition filed. |
Aug 28 2013 | Reply of petitioner James Louis Peppin filed. |
Sep 4 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Daniel Joseph Koewler | 2780 Snelling Avenue North Suite 330 | (651)-604-0000 |
Roseville, MN 55113 | ||
dan@ramsayresults.com | ||
Party name: James Louis Peppin | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Matthew G. Frank | Assistant Attorney General | (651)-757-1448 |
Counsel of Record | 445 Minnesota Street | |
Suite 1800 | ||
St. Paul, MN 55101-2134 | ||
matthew.frank@ag.state.mn.us | ||
Party name: Minnesota Commissioner of Public Safety | ||
Tibor Matthew Gallo | Minnesota Attorney General's Office | (651) 215-1560 |
1800 Bremer Tower, 445 Minnesota Street | ||
St. Paul, MN 55101 | ||
Party name: Minnesota Commissioner of Public Safety |